+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (9-0).
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0-1). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2019: House Vote on SCR 18, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#857)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
April 24, 2019: Senate Vote on SCR 18, ADOPT (#124)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor