+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/1/2016.
On March 29, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 18, ADOPT (#22)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor