+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 174, AMENDMENT # BY , ADOPT (#1476)
- Yeas: 30
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsors (143)
Type:
Primary Sponsor