+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
April 22, 2019: Senate Vote on SCR 17, ADOPT (#80)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor