+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted.
- Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
- Rules suspended.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor