+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on SCR 162, ADOPT (#1289)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor