+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 141, CO-AUTHORS (#1179)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 31, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 141, ADOPT (#1179)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor