+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 80 yeas, 0 nays.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0).
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2018: House Vote on SCR 13, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#979)
- Yeas: 80
- Absent: 25
April 3, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 13, ADOPT (#240)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor