+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2013.
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 92 yeas, 2 nays.
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/5/2013.
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/4/2013.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 2, 2013 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 5, 2013: House Vote on SCR 120, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#901)
- Yeas: 92
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 11
May 31, 2013: Senate Vote on SCR 120, ADOPT (#818)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor