+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
+ − Vote
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 118, ADOPT (#1117)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8