+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/15/2015.
On June 7, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 88 yeas, 0 nays.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/03/2015.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On May 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
June 3, 2015: House Vote on SCR 115, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#738)
- Yeas: 88
- Absent: 17
May 28, 2015: Senate Vote on SCR 115, ADOPT (#592)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor