+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 97 yeas, 0 nays.
- Rules suspended, called out of its regular order.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19.
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Called from the calendar.
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
- Rules suspended.
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 5, 2019: Senate Vote on SCR 114, CONCUR (#975)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 12
June 3, 2019: House Vote on SCR 114, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#925)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 30, 2019: Senate Vote on SCR 114, ADOPT (#615)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor