+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Vote
May 9, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 110, ADOPT (#895)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8