+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/4/2021.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted.
- Rules suspended.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor