+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
- Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2016: House Vote on SCR 102, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#1130)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 6
May 25, 2016: Senate Vote on SCR 102, ADOPT (#1021)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor