+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, concurred in by vote of 79 yeas, 0 nays.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/18.
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (8-0).
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 22, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On March 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 10, CONCUR (#635)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
April 27, 2018: House Vote on SCR 10, FINAL CONSIDERATION (#608)
- Yeas: 79
- Absent: 26
March 22, 2018: Senate Vote on SCR 10, ADOPT (#119)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Regina Ashford Barrow
Type:
Primary Sponsor