+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021.
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
- Received in the House from the Senate.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
+ − Vote
May 4, 2021: Senate Vote on SCR 10, ADOPT (#229)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor