+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 269.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/20/2016.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 16, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016.
On May 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 20, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
May 18, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 90, CONCUR (#855)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 16, 2016: House Vote on SB 90, FINAL PASSAGE (#803)
- Yeas: 85
- Absent: 19
April 18, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 90, FINAL PASSAGE (#304)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 90, CO-AUTHORS (#305)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 17
+ − Sponsors (39)
Type:
Primary Sponsor