+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2017.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/9/2017.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 91, nays 1. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 6, 2017 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Stefanski, Berthelot, and Hensgens.
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Perry, Peterson, and Donahue.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/17.
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (5)
June 8, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 86, ADOPT (#944)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 2
June 8, 2017: House Vote on SB 86, MOTION TO ADOPT (#950)
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 13
May 30, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 86, REJECT (#513)
- Yeas: 38
May 23, 2017: House Vote on SB 86, FINAL PASSAGE (#426)
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 14
April 24, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 86, FINAL PASSAGE (#87)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor