+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2021.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 385.
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays.
On June 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 2, 2021 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2021.
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 8, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 8, CONCUR (#970)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
June 3, 2021: House Vote on SB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#959)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
April 21, 2021: Senate Vote on SB 8, FINAL PASSAGE (#78)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor