+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor