+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 645.
- Effective date 6/1/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 87, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported favorably (19-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/18.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
- Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 27 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 73, CONCUR (#1333)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 17, 2018: House Vote on SB 73, FINAL PASSAGE (#1262)
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 16
May 11, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 73, FINAL PASSAGE (#1023)
- Yeas: 27
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor