+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 15, nays 81. Failed to pass.
- Called from the calendar.
On June 4, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/17.
- Notice given.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/17.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (5-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
June 5, 2017: House Vote on SB 72, AMENDMENT # 3898 BY MORRIS, JAY, MOTION TO ADOPT (#784)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 50
- Absent: 6
June 5, 2017: House Vote on SB 72, FINAL PASSAGE (#785)
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 81
- Absent: 9
May 8, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 72, FINAL PASSAGE (#230)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor