+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 340.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
- Rules suspended.
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 28, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/19.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 66, CONCUR (#608)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2019: House Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#624)
- Yeas: 96
- Absent: 9
April 29, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#151)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor