+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 156.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: House Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#616)
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 19
May 12, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 66, FINAL PASSAGE (#290)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor