+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 155.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/1/2015.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2015: House Vote on SB 64, FINAL PASSAGE (#615)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
April 28, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 64, FINAL PASSAGE (#131)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor