+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 475.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2014.
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 22, 2014: House Vote on SB 610, FINAL PASSAGE (#1166)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 9
April 16, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 610, FINAL PASSAGE (#417)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor