+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/1/2015.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 446.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/12/2015.
- Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
- Rules suspended.
- Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Hensgens, Simon, and Arnold.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays.
- Senate conference committee members appointed: Buffington, Heitmeier, and Nevers.
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/08/2015.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Votes (5)
June 11, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 61, ADOPT (#1113)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
June 11, 2015: House Vote on SB 61, ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#1115)
- Yeas: 95
- Absent: 10
June 9, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 61, REJECT (#1003)
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
June 8, 2015: House Vote on SB 61, FINAL PASSAGE (#862)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 8
May 20, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 61, FINAL PASSAGE (#418)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor