+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Title of substitute read and adopted; becomes Senate Bill No. 684.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported by substitute.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor