+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 1, 2018 in the House:
- Involuntarily deferred in committee.
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 17 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title; ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Vote
May 30, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 6, FINAL PASSAGE (#35)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor