+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 765.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/28/2014.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (8)
+ − Votes (3)
May 29, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 582, CONCUR (#1537)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 28, 2014: House Vote on SB 582, FINAL PASSAGE (#1302)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 4
April 21, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 582, FINAL PASSAGE (#427)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor