+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
May 5, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 571, FINAL PASSAGE (#680)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor