+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2019.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 337.
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2019: House Vote on SB 55, FINAL PASSAGE (#671)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
May 2, 2019: Senate Vote on SB 55, FINAL PASSAGE (#229)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor