+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 675.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 74, nays 9. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/18.
On May 9, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 17, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 549, CONCUR (#1277)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 16, 2018: House Vote on SB 549, FINAL PASSAGE (#1194)
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 21
May 2, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 549, SB 549 BY HEWITT (#700)
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor