+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 2 nays.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (17-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 14, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 13 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
- Rules suspended.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 543, CONCUR (#1650)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
May 29, 2014: House Vote on SB 543, FINAL PASSAGE (#1405)
- Yeas: 97
- Absent: 7
May 12, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 543, RECOMMIT (#832)
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 3
May 12, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 543, FINAL PASSAGE (#833)
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 13
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor