+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 311.
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 19, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/2014.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2014: House Vote on SB 537, FINAL PASSAGE (#981)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 13
April 15, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 537, FINAL PASSAGE (#391)
- Yeas: 38
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor