+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 575.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/22/2018.
On May 18, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 17, 2018 in the House:
- Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays.
- Reconsidered.
- Rules suspended.
- Senate conference committee members appointed: LaFleur, Gary Smith, and Donahue.
- Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 69, nays 19. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/18.
On May 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 525, REJECT (#1274)
- Yeas: 31
- Absent: 8
May 17, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 525, CONCUR (#1321)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 6
May 15, 2018: House Vote on SB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#1104)
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 19
- Absent: 16
April 16, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 525, FINAL PASSAGE (#400)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor