+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 5/25/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 488.
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 11, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/18.
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (3)
May 14, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 496, CONCUR (#1083)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
May 11, 2018: House Vote on SB 496, FINAL PASSAGE (#994)
- Yeas: 81
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 22
April 18, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 496, FINAL PASSAGE (#435)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor