+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 11 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On March 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
April 11, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 493, FINAL PASSAGE (#376)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 11
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor