+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2018.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 417.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 14, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 3, 2018 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/18.
On April 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On March 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On March 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2018: House Vote on SB 471, FINAL PASSAGE (#949)
- Yeas: 91
- Absent: 14
April 3, 2018: Senate Vote on SB 471, FINAL PASSAGE (#213)
- Yeas: 36
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor