+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/17/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 620.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 6, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (16-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 5, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 454, CONCUR (#1327)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
June 3, 2016: House Vote on SB 454, FINAL PASSAGE (#1251)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 18, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 454, FINAL PASSAGE (#862)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor