+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/4/2020.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 44.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 2. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/27/20.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 20, 2020 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Reported with amendments (13-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
On May 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
On March 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 450, CONCUR (#442)
- Yeas: 32
- Absent: 7
May 27, 2020: House Vote on SB 450, FINAL PASSAGE (#472)
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 9
May 11, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 450, FINAL PASSAGE (#120)
- Yeas: 37
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor