+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 465.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 27, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
- Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 15, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014.
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 22, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 442, CONCUR (#1319)
- Yeas: 35
- Absent: 4
May 20, 2014: House Vote on SB 442, FINAL PASSAGE (#1086)
- Yeas: 99
- Absent: 5
April 16, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 442, FINAL PASSAGE (#410)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor