+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/18/2014.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 709.
On June 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/2014.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Reported favorably (18-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 12, 2014 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 29, 2014: House Vote on SB 441, FINAL PASSAGE (#1401)
- Yeas: 92
- Absent: 12
May 7, 2014: Senate Vote on SB 441, FINAL PASSAGE (#779)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor