+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 8/1/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 182.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 1, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House without amendments.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 11, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2017: House Vote on SB 44, FINAL PASSAGE (#552)
- Yeas: 94
- Absent: 11
May 9, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 44, FINAL PASSAGE (#251)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor