+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective date: See Act.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 245.
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays.
On June 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On June 1, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 6/04/2015.
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (4)
June 8, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 43, CONCUR (#967)
- Yeas: 39
June 4, 2015: House Vote on SB 43, FINAL PASSAGE (#784)
- Yeas: 89
- Absent: 16
June 4, 2015: House Vote on SB 43, FINAL PASSAGE (#784)
- Yeas: 90
- Absent: 15
May 20, 2015: Senate Vote on SB 43, FINAL PASSAGE (#412)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor