+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 14 yeas and 13 nays.
- Called from the Calendar.
On May 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Vote
May 10, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 424, FINAL PASSAGE (#667)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 23
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor