+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/2/2020.
On June 1, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On May 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 2 nays.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 28. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported favorably (12-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
- Rules suspended.
- Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/20.
On May 22, 2020 in the House:
- Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
- Discharged from the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 21, 2020 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On March 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On March 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (5)
May 31, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 423, CONCUR (#645)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 5
May 29, 2020: House Vote on SB 423, AMENDMENT # 2696 BY MARCELLE, MOTION TO ADOPT (#600)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 65
- Absent: 10
May 29, 2020: House Vote on SB 423, AMENDMENT # 2824 BY MILLER, G., MOTION TO ADOPT (#601)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 10
May 29, 2020: House Vote on SB 423, FINAL PASSAGE (#602)
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 28
- Absent: 10
May 20, 2020: Senate Vote on SB 423, FINAL PASSAGE (#274)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor