+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/16/2016.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 514.
On June 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 18. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2016 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Reported with amendments (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported with amendments.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 412, CONCUR (#1197)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
May 31, 2016: House Vote on SB 412, FINAL PASSAGE (#1113)
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 17
- Absent: 15
May 11, 2016: Senate Vote on SB 412, FINAL PASSAGE (#724)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor