+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 6/12/2017.
- Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 162.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by the Speaker of the House.
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from the House with amendments.
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
- Called from the calendar.
- Read by title, returned to the calendar.
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/17.
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
On May 18, 2017 in the House:
- Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably.
On April 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 39, CONCUR (#596)
- Yeas: 34
- Absent: 4
May 31, 2017: House Vote on SB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#564)
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 7
May 1, 2017: Senate Vote on SB 39, FINAL PASSAGE (#160)
- Yeas: 33
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor